第115師[編輯]
1938年12月,第115師師部率領第343旅離開開赴山東。1940年10月,部隊整編為六個教導旅。代理師長陳光、政治委員羅榮桓、參謀長陳士榘、政治部主任肖華。
1938年12月,第115師師部率領第343旅離開開赴山東。1940年10月,部隊整編為六個教導旅。代理師長陳光、政治委員羅榮桓、參謀長陳士榘、政治部主任肖華。
• 你還不如問我,1945年8月115師編成有8個師和13個教導旅及5個軍區 。 -老生常談12- ♂ (124 bytes) () 06/23/2021 postreply 10:05:17
• 八路軍的營長後來都是中將,旅長很多是大將了,所以我問他:“是對應林彪是師長的八路軍旅長?” -caral- ♂ (0 bytes) () 06/23/2021 postreply 10:17:26
WENXUECITY.COM does not represent or guarantee the truthfulness, accuracy, or reliability of any of communications posted by other users.
Copyright ©1998-2024 wenxuecity.com All rights reserved. Privacy Statement & Terms of Use & User Privacy Protection Policy